THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: (905) 813-4036
Address: Rexdale Doctors Clinic
Unit 39A
1530 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1B4
Phone: (416) 744-3019
Fax: (416) 744-6560
Address: Multispecialty Medical Clinic
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-9229
Fax: (905) 897-0788

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ikram Ghani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ghani (CPSO#: 78399 )
Business Address: 39A - 1530 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1B4
(416) 744-3019
Business Address: 111 - 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9229
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: (905) 813-4036
Address: Rexdale Doctors Clinic
Unit 39A
1530 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1B4
Phone: (416) 744-3019
Fax: (416) 744-6560
Address: Multispecialty Medical Clinic
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-9229
Fax: (905) 897-0788

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ikram Ghani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ghani (CPSO#: 78399 )
Business Address: 39A - 1530 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1B4
(416) 744-3019
Business Address: 111 - 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9229
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Mar 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 04 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ikram Ghani may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ikram Ghani may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2002