THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 802 Southdown Road
Unit C4, as a locum
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 628 1930
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Company

company address:
1-High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON
M9L0A3

Tel# 1-800-775-0093
Fax# 647-933-2904
Date Received: 10 Sep 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rose Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hanna (CPSO#: 78403 )
Business Address: Britannia Medical Clinic
Unit 3
5980 Churchill Meadows Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M5
(905) 814-1342
Business Address: 802 Southdown Road
Unit C4
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 802 Southdown Road
Unit C4, as a locum
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 628 1930
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Company

company address:
1-High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON
M9L0A3

Tel# 1-800-775-0093
Fax# 647-933-2904
Date Received: 10 Sep 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rose Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hanna (CPSO#: 78403 )
Business Address: Britannia Medical Clinic
Unit 3
5980 Churchill Meadows Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7M5
(905) 814-1342
Business Address: 802 Southdown Road
Unit C4
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSE KAMEL FAHIM AWAD HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSE KAMEL FAHIM AWAD HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mansoura University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002