THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Barankin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barankin (CPSO#: 78418 )
Business Address: Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 633-0001

Corporation Name: Barankin & Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Barankin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barankin (CPSO#: 78418 )
Business Address: Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 633-0001

Corporation Name: Barankin & Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BARANKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARANKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BARANKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARANKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2002