THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:25:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 2395
Fax: (416) 864-6073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Aug 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Berger (CPSO#: 78439 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
30 Bond Street
Suite 15-018B
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 2395
Fax: (416) 864-6073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Aug 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Berger (CPSO#: 78439 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
30 Bond Street
Suite 15-018B
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Jun 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 20 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Howard Phillip Berger may practise medicine independently in maternal fetal
medicine and obstetrics, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Howard Phillip Berger may practise medicine independently in maternal fetal
medicine and obstetrics, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2002