THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:40:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London Regional Cancer Program
A3-917
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8640
Fax: 519-685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Younus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Younus (CPSO#: 78440 )
Business Address: A3-916
800 Commissioners Road East
P O Box 5010, Stn B
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London Regional Cancer Program
A3-917
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8640
Fax: 519-685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Younus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Younus (CPSO#: 78440 )
Business Address: A3-916
800 Commissioners Road East
P O Box 5010, Stn B
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8640

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAWAID YOUNUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAWAID YOUNUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2002