THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:02:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Sadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. El-Sadi (CPSO#: 78473 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Sadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. El-Sadi (CPSO#: 78473 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN ABDEL KHADER SALMAN EL-SADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN ABDEL KHADER SALMAN EL-SADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2002