THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:35:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Boston University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew S. Benjamin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Benjamin (CPSO#: 78474 )
Business Address: Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Address: 75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Address: Department of Radiology
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Boston University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew S. Benjamin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Benjamin (CPSO#: 78474 )
Business Address: Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Address: 75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Address: Department of Radiology
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW STEPHEN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW STEPHEN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Boston University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2002