THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tartu, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Government Rd E
Blanche River Health
Kirkland lake side
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 568-2155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Jefremova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jefremova (CPSO#: 78482 )
Business Address: East Whitby Medical Centre
6 - 1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L6
(905) 434-7448
Business Address: 9-145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake Ontario L5N 3E7
(905) 288-1021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Tartu, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Government Rd E
Blanche River Health
Kirkland lake side
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 568-2155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Jefremova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jefremova (CPSO#: 78482 )
Business Address: East Whitby Medical Centre
6 - 1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L6
(905) 434-7448
Business Address: 9-145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake Ontario L5N 3E7
(905) 288-1021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LJUDMILLA JEFREMOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFREMOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LJUDMILLA JEFREMOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFREMOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Nov 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: Effective August 8, 2018, Dr. Jefremova has completed all components of her SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Nov 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: As of May 17, 2018, Dr. Jefremova completed the requirements of her SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Nov 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: Effective August 8, 2018, Dr. Jefremova has completed all components of her SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Nov 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: As of May 17, 2018, Dr. Jefremova completed the requirements of her SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Tartu, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2002