THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital Campus
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Extension: 33530
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494 2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sameer D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. D'Souza (CPSO#: 78485 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3530
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital Campus
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Extension: 33530
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494 2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sameer D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. D'Souza (CPSO#: 78485 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3530
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER DOMINIC D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER DOMINIC D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2002