THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:19:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cecile D. Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davey (CPSO#: 78502 )
Business Address: Suite 105
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
(519) 569-7711
Business Address: 203-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cecile D. Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davey (CPSO#: 78502 )
Business Address: Suite 105
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
(519) 569-7711
Business Address: 203-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CECILE DELAINE DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CECILE DELAINE DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 May 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2002