THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:15:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
Roth|McFarlane
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6286
Fax: (519) 646-6049

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruby Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. r. grewal (CPSO#: 78511 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Hand and Upper Limb Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
D0-215
London Ontario N6A 4L6
(519) 646-6286

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
Roth|McFarlane
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6286
Fax: (519) 646-6049

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruby Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. r. grewal (CPSO#: 78511 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Hand and Upper Limb Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
D0-215
London Ontario N6A 4L6
(519) 646-6286

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBY RAVINDER GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBY RAVINDER GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2002