THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:51:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Zina Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-4251
Fax: (519) 942-2047
Address: Stephenson Memorial Hospital
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Seto (CPSO#: 78562 )
Business Address: 4 Zina St 5199414251
Business Address: 4 Zina St

Corporation Name: Seto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Zina Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-4251
Fax: (519) 942-2047
Address: Stephenson Memorial Hospital
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Seto (CPSO#: 78562 )
Business Address: 4 Zina St 5199414251
Business Address: 4 Zina St

Corporation Name: Seto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND JAMES SETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND JAMES SETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2002