THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-17250 Highway 27
Schomberg ON L0G 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 584 9377
Fax: 905 584 5283

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brindusa Popa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Popa (CPSO#: 78565 )
Business Address: 11 Goodwill Ave
North York ON M3H 1V5
416 650 0973
Business Address: 15955 Airport Road
Suite 103
Caledon Ontario L7C 1H9
(905) 584-9377

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12-17250 Highway 27
Schomberg ON L0G 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 584 9377
Fax: 905 584 5283

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brindusa Popa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Popa (CPSO#: 78565 )
Business Address: 11 Goodwill Ave
North York ON M3H 1V5
416 650 0973
Business Address: 15955 Airport Road
Suite 103
Caledon Ontario L7C 1H9
(905) 584-9377

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRINDUSA MARINA POPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRINDUSA MARINA POPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2002