THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:07:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karaganda State Medical Institute, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9V 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-7777
Fax: 905-388-8805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikolay Kaplan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaplan (CPSO#: 78605 )
Business Address: 849 Upper Wentworth St
Suite 300
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
905-387-7777

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikolay Kaplan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 May 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Karaganda State Medical Institute, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9V 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-7777
Fax: 905-388-8805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikolay Kaplan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaplan (CPSO#: 78605 )
Business Address: 849 Upper Wentworth St
Suite 300
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
905-387-7777

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikolay Kaplan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 May 2009

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 May 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 24 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nikolay Semionovich Kaplan may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nikolay Semionovich Kaplan may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Nov 2009
Summary of Decision:
On November 10, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kaplan committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice; and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

In October 2005, Dr. Kaplan physically assaulted a prostitute. In February 2007, Dr. Kaplan was found guilty of this assault, which included hitting and kicking. In September 2007, he was sentenced in respect of this offence. Dr. Kaplan failed to disclose the charges to the Medical Advisory Committee, the Credentialing Committee or the Chief of Staff at Cambridge Memorial Hospital, and he made a misrepresentation on his reappointment application to the Hospital for two consecutive years. Dr. Kaplan also failed to advise the College, when asked in writing on his 2005 and 2006 Annual Renewal Forms, that he was facing the criminal charges described above.

Furthermore, Dr. Kaplan's care and treatment of 22 patients fell below the standard of practice, including, but not limited to, his incomplete and inadequate documentation, management of hypertension, lack of follow-up with respect to abnormal lab results, and his use of certain combinations of anti-hypertensive medications.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Kaplan's certificate of registration:

a) Dr. Kaplan shall successfully complete the College's Medical Record-Keeping for
Physicians course and the follow-up component at the earliest available date and
shall provide proof of same to the College upon completion.

2. The Registrar shall forthwith suspend Dr. Kaplan's certificate of registration for a period
of twelve (12) months. The Registrar shall suspend nine (9) months of this suspension:
a) In consideration of the fact that Dr. Kaplan's certification of registration has been
effectively suspended since October 31, 2008; and
 
b) On the condition that Dr. Kaplan make himself available to College staff within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order to schedule his participation in the Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course; and that he fully co-operate with the scheduling and attendance of this course at the earliest available date.

3. Dr. Kaplan appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on the register.

4. Dr. Kaplan pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from the date of the Order.

5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 9-11 and Nov 13, Nov 23-27, 2009

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Nov 2009
Summary of Decision:
On November 10, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kaplan committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice; and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

In October 2005, Dr. Kaplan physically assaulted a prostitute. In February 2007, Dr. Kaplan was found guilty of this assault, which included hitting and kicking. In September 2007, he was sentenced in respect of this offence. Dr. Kaplan failed to disclose the charges to the Medical Advisory Committee, the Credentialing Committee or the Chief of Staff at Cambridge Memorial Hospital, and he made a misrepresentation on his reappointment application to the Hospital for two consecutive years. Dr. Kaplan also failed to advise the College, when asked in writing on his 2005 and 2006 Annual Renewal Forms, that he was facing the criminal charges described above.

Furthermore, Dr. Kaplan's care and treatment of 22 patients fell below the standard of practice, including, but not limited to, his incomplete and inadequate documentation, management of hypertension, lack of follow-up with respect to abnormal lab results, and his use of certain combinations of anti-hypertensive medications.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Kaplan's certificate of registration:

a) Dr. Kaplan shall successfully complete the College's Medical Record-Keeping for
Physicians course and the follow-up component at the earliest available date and
shall provide proof of same to the College upon completion.

2. The Registrar shall forthwith suspend Dr. Kaplan's certificate of registration for a period
of twelve (12) months. The Registrar shall suspend nine (9) months of this suspension:
a) In consideration of the fact that Dr. Kaplan's certification of registration has been
effectively suspended since October 31, 2008; and
 
b) On the condition that Dr. Kaplan make himself available to College staff within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order to schedule his participation in the Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course; and that he fully co-operate with the scheduling and attendance of this course at the earliest available date.

3. Dr. Kaplan appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on the register.

4. Dr. Kaplan pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from the date of the Order.

5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 9-11 and Nov 13, Nov 23-27, 2009

Training

Medical School: Karaganda State Medical Institute, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2002