THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Liem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Liem (CPSO#: 78631 )
Business Address: D - 1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
(519) 258-4356

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Liem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Liem (CPSO#: 78631 )
Business Address: D - 1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
(519) 258-4356

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL JONATHAN SAN BING LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL JONATHAN SAN BING LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2002