THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:55:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkway Forest Medical Center
Suite 40
105 Parkway Forest Drive
North York Ontario M2J 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 502-3404
Fax: (416) 502-3017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faris Nazal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nazal (CPSO#: 78647 )
Business Address: 40 - 105 Parkway Forest Drive
North York Ontario M2J 1L8
(416) 502-3404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkway Forest Medical Center
Suite 40
105 Parkway Forest Drive
North York Ontario M2J 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 502-3404
Fax: (416) 502-3017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faris Nazal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nazal (CPSO#: 78647 )
Business Address: 40 - 105 Parkway Forest Drive
North York Ontario M2J 1L8
(416) 502-3404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIS AZIZ NAZAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIS AZIZ NAZAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2002