THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Main Street
Unit 4
Bath ON K0H 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-3960
Fax: 613-354-8077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Andrawis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Andrawis (CPSO#: 78653 )
Business Address: 89 Dundas Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 1Z7
(613) 354-3960
Business Address: 193 Main St
220 main st
unit 4
Bath ON K0H 1G0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Main Street
Unit 4
Bath ON K0H 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-3960
Fax: 613-354-8077

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Andrawis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Andrawis (CPSO#: 78653 )
Business Address: 89 Dundas Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 1Z7
(613) 354-3960
Business Address: 193 Main St
220 main st
unit 4
Bath ON K0H 1G0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAMDOUH NABIL RIAD ANDRAWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRAWIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAMDOUH NABIL RIAD ANDRAWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRAWIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2002