THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT B6
350 CONESTOGA BLVD
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 622-5100
Fax: (519) 622-2977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheen Morar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morar (CPSO#: 78668 )
Business Address: B6 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 622-5100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT B6
350 CONESTOGA BLVD
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 622-5100
Fax: (519) 622-2977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheen Morar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morar (CPSO#: 78668 )
Business Address: B6 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 622-5100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHEEN MORAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHEEN MORAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2002