THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 587 River road West
Unit #6
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-220-1710
Fax: 705-717-7560

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Furtado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Furtado (CPSO#: 78672 )
Business Address: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W8
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 6-587 River Rd W
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 2P2
705-220-1710

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 587 River road West
Unit #6
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-220-1710
Fax: 705-717-7560

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Furtado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Furtado (CPSO#: 78672 )
Business Address: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W8
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 6-587 River Rd W
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 2P2
705-220-1710

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD JOSEPH FURTADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURTADO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD JOSEPH FURTADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURTADO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2002