THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:57:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-658 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164610093
Fax: 4164613976

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dracopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dracopoulos (CPSO#: 78677 )
Business Address: 658 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 5B9

Corporation Name: Dracopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-658 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164610093
Fax: 4164613976

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dracopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dracopoulos (CPSO#: 78677 )
Business Address: 658 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 5B9

Corporation Name: Dracopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS THEODORE DRACOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRACOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS THEODORE DRACOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRACOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2002