THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:47:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology
McLaughlin Pavilion, 7th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 5729
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renato P. Munhoz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Munhoz (CPSO#: 78681 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
McL 7, Office 7MC 413
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 5214

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology
McLaughlin Pavilion, 7th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 5729
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renato P. Munhoz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Munhoz (CPSO#: 78681 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
McL 7, Office 7MC 413
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 5214

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Apr 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 06 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Renato Puppi Munhoz may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Munhoz
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Munhoz no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Renato Puppi Munhoz may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Munhoz
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Munhoz no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2002