THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 08:52:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kurnool Medical College, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PURANAM KRISHNA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Popuri (CPSO#: 78917 ) Dr. P. Krishna (CPSO#: 78690 )
Business Address: 178 Trailridge Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 6L8
705-522-0907

Corporation Name: Puranam Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU
Medical School: Kurnool Medical College, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PURANAM KRISHNA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Popuri (CPSO#: 78917 ) Dr. P. Krishna (CPSO#: 78690 )
Business Address: 178 Trailridge Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 6L8
705-522-0907

Corporation Name: Puranam Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POPURI MURALI KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POPURI MURALI KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kurnool Medical College, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Feb 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2002