THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TELUGU, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhagavatula Sastry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhagavatula (CPSO#: 78733 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-5900 Extn: 8234
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TELUGU, URDU
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhagavatula Sastry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhagavatula (CPSO#: 78733 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-5900 Extn: 8234
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBRAMANYA SASTRY BHAGAVATULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAGAVATULA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBRAMANYA SASTRY BHAGAVATULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAGAVATULA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002