THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:23:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056 Station C
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natasha Yepes Restrepo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera (CPSO#: 78746 ) Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo (CPSO#: 79369 )
Business Address: 31 Kingsway Drive
Suite 501
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2L9
(519) 745-6556

Corporation Name: Castano Herrera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera (CPSO#: 78746 ) Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo (CPSO#: 79369 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
P.O. Box 9056 Station C
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 744-7361

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056 Station C
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natasha Yepes Restrepo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera (CPSO#: 78746 ) Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo (CPSO#: 79369 )
Business Address: 31 Kingsway Drive
Suite 501
Kitchener Ontario N2A 2L9
(519) 745-6556

Corporation Name: Castano Herrera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera (CPSO#: 78746 ) Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo (CPSO#: 79369 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
P.O. Box 9056 Station C
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 744-7361

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELKIN DARIO CASTANO HERRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTANO HERRERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELKIN DARIO CASTANO HERRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTANO HERRERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2003