THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mohummed, Shamsia (Used Until: 11 Jul 2007)
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 385 Wilson St E
Ancaster Physicians
unit A3
Ancaster ON L9G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894439543
Fax: 2892630212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Nainar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nainar (CPSO#: 78756 )
Business Address: Dundurn Medical Centre Inc
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W3
(905) 529-4040
Business Address: Mountain Medical Walk In Clinic
880 Upper Wentworth
Suite 5A
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H2
(905) 575-0808
Business Address: Stoney Creek Medical Walk in Clinic
140 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton Ontario L8E 1H9
(905) 561-9255
Business Address: 385 Wilson St E
Suite A3 (basement)
Ancaster ON L9G 2C1
289-443-9543

Corporation Name: Shamsia Mohummed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Mar 2007

General Information

Former Name: Mohummed, Shamsia (Used Until: 11 Jul 2007)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 385 Wilson St E
Ancaster Physicians
unit A3
Ancaster ON L9G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894439543
Fax: 2892630212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Nainar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nainar (CPSO#: 78756 )
Business Address: Dundurn Medical Centre Inc
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W3
(905) 529-4040
Business Address: Mountain Medical Walk In Clinic
880 Upper Wentworth
Suite 5A
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H2
(905) 575-0808
Business Address: Stoney Creek Medical Walk in Clinic
140 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton Ontario L8E 1H9
(905) 561-9255
Business Address: 385 Wilson St E
Suite A3 (basement)
Ancaster ON L9G 2C1
289-443-9543

Corporation Name: Shamsia Mohummed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Mar 2007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMSIA NAINAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAINAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMSIA NAINAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAINAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2003