THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:26:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3826 Bloor ST W
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 231-2233
Fax: (416) 231-2234

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Olah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Olah (CPSO#: 84822 ) Dr. M. Olah (CPSO#: 78764 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3826 Bloor ST W
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 231-2233
Fax: (416) 231-2234

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Olah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Olah (CPSO#: 84822 ) Dr. M. Olah (CPSO#: 78764 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKETA OLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKETA OLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2003