THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinicare Medical Centre
Suite 106
2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 293-5454
Fax: (416) 293-7454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roubiya Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohamed (CPSO#: 78767 )
Business Address: 3 - 2250 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 2W4
(416) 293-5454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinicare Medical Centre
Suite 106
2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 293-5454
Fax: (416) 293-7454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roubiya Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohamed (CPSO#: 78767 )
Business Address: 3 - 2250 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 2W4
(416) 293-5454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROUBIYA SAMEEM MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROUBIYA SAMEEM MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2003