THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Welland Paediatric Associates
390 Lincoln Street East
Welland Ontario L3B 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 788-1915
Fax: (905) 788-1779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al Darazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Al-Darazi (CPSO#: 78780 )
Business Address: Welland Pediatric Associates
390 Lincoln Street East
Welland Ontario L3B 4N4
(905) 788-1777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Welland Paediatric Associates
390 Lincoln Street East
Welland Ontario L3B 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 788-1915
Fax: (905) 788-1779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al Darazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Al-Darazi (CPSO#: 78780 )
Business Address: Welland Pediatric Associates
390 Lincoln Street East
Welland Ontario L3B 4N4
(905) 788-1777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUNESS ALI AL-DARAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DARAZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUNESS ALI AL-DARAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DARAZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2003