THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Methadone Clinic
118 Victoria Street N
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 337-5000
Fax: (519) 337-4406
Address: 233 Cameron St
Corunna Ontario N0N 1G0
Phone: (518) 813-9800
Fax: (519) 813-9898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Vouriot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vouriot (CPSO#: 78786 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Methadone Clinic
118 Victoria Street N
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 337-5000
Fax: (519) 337-4406
Address: 233 Cameron St
Corunna Ontario N0N 1G0
Phone: (518) 813-9800
Fax: (519) 813-9898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Vouriot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vouriot (CPSO#: 78786 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DENIS VOURIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOURIOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DENIS VOURIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOURIOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2003
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2003