THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:43:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Fax: (519) 744-1168
Address: St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd,
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SYEDA FATIMA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL MEDICINE CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fatima (CPSO#: 78796 )
Business Address: 5195720556

Corporation Name: Syeda Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Oct 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, TELUGU, URDU
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Fax: (519) 744-1168
Address: St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd,
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SYEDA FATIMA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL MEDICINE CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fatima (CPSO#: 78796 )
Business Address: 5195720556

Corporation Name: Syeda Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Oct 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYEDA FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYEDA FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 May 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2003