THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:24:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurosurgery
2075 Bayview Av S126
Toronto Ontario M4N3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4806100
Extension: 3318
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 23 Jan 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. HAMANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamani (CPSO#: 78818 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
S1 26
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurosurgery
2075 Bayview Av S126
Toronto Ontario M4N3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4806100
Extension: 3318
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 23 Jan 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. HAMANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamani (CPSO#: 78818 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
S1 26
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Aug 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 29 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Clement Hamani may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of Neurosurgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.Hamani
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.Hamani no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Clement Hamani may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of Neurosurgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.Hamani
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.Hamani no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Apr 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2003