THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117 Hunter Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 526-0555
Fax: (905) 526-0515
Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: 905-897-8928
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7555 Montrose Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2H 2E9
Phone: 289-292-0441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. MJ Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dube (CPSO#: 78841 )
Business Address: 117 Hunter Street East
1st Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M5
(905) 526-0555
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-8928
Business Address: 7555 Montrose Rd
unit E2
Niagara Falls ON L2H 2E9
289-292-0441

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117 Hunter Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 526-0555
Fax: (905) 526-0515
Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: 905-897-8928
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7555 Montrose Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2H 2E9
Phone: 289-292-0441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. MJ Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dube (CPSO#: 78841 )
Business Address: 117 Hunter Street East
1st Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M5
(905) 526-0555
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-8928
Business Address: 7555 Montrose Rd
unit E2
Niagara Falls ON L2H 2E9
289-292-0441

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 May 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 May 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2003