THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:56:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 210
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-2102
Fax: (519) 641-2103

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jorg Aswald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aswald (CPSO#: 78866 )
Business Address: Unit 210
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 641-2102

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 210
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-2102
Fax: (519) 641-2103

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jorg Aswald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aswald (CPSO#: 78866 )
Business Address: Unit 210
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 641-2102

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORG MICHAEL ASWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASWALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORG MICHAEL ASWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASWALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2003