THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universit of The City of Manila, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473526188
Fax: 6473529288
Address: 935 SHEPPARD AVENUE WEST, UNIT 1-3
North York Ontario M3H 2T7
Phone: (647) 352-6188
Fax: (647) 352-9288
Address: 6-700 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1H 2A7
Phone: 4164317100
Fax: 4164317191
Address: 105-778 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto ON M3H 6B7
Phone: 647 352 6188
Fax: 647 352 9288
Address: 700 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 2A7
Phone: 4164317100
Fax: 4164317191

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reynaldo P. Robes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Robes (CPSO#: 78869 )
Business Address: unit 101-3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Z3
Business Address: 935 Sheppard Avenue East
Suites 1 2 and 3
North York Ontario M3H 2T7
(647) 352-6188
Business Address: Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Road Unit 6
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 431-7100
Business Address: 778 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 6B7
6473526188

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG
Medical School: Universit of The City of Manila, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473526188
Fax: 6473529288
Address: 935 SHEPPARD AVENUE WEST, UNIT 1-3
North York Ontario M3H 2T7
Phone: (647) 352-6188
Fax: (647) 352-9288
Address: 6-700 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1H 2A7
Phone: 4164317100
Fax: 4164317191
Address: 105-778 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto ON M3H 6B7
Phone: 647 352 6188
Fax: 647 352 9288
Address: 700 Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 2A7
Phone: 4164317100
Fax: 4164317191

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reynaldo P. Robes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Robes (CPSO#: 78869 )
Business Address: unit 101-3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Z3
Business Address: 935 Sheppard Avenue East
Suites 1 2 and 3
North York Ontario M3H 2T7
(647) 352-6188
Business Address: Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Road Unit 6
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 431-7100
Business Address: 778 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 6B7
6473526188

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REYNALDO PEREZ ROBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REYNALDO PEREZ ROBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universit of The City of Manila, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2003