THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:24:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ITALIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Address: 23-5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Ottawa Ontario K1C6V8
Phone: 6137495421
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 09 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Chamoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chamoun (CPSO#: 78883 )
Business Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ITALIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Address: 23-5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Ottawa Ontario K1C6V8
Phone: 6137495421
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 09 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Chamoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chamoun (CPSO#: 78883 )
Business Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMOUN CHAMOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMOUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMOUN CHAMOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMOUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2003
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2003