THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:50:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Red Blood Cell Disorders Clinic
9NU-995
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-340-5233
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farzana Sayani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sayani (CPSO#: 78893 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Red Blood Cell Disorders Clinic
9NU-995
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-340-5233
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farzana Sayani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sayani (CPSO#: 78893 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARZANA AZIM SAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARZANA AZIM SAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Apr 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2003