THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 10:55:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: D'Cunha, Chrysal Dorothy Emiliana (Used Until: 28 Sep 2006)
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 265-6663
Fax: (416) 265-1263

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Cunha Rebello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. D'Cunha Rebello (CPSO#: 78929 )
Business Address: 205 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3C3
(416) 265-6663

General Information

Former Name: D'Cunha, Chrysal Dorothy Emiliana (Used Until: 28 Sep 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 265-6663
Fax: (416) 265-1263

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Cunha Rebello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. D'Cunha Rebello (CPSO#: 78929 )
Business Address: 205 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3C3
(416) 265-6663

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRYSAL DOROTHY EMILIANA D'CUNHA REBELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'CUNHA REBELLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRYSAL DOROTHY EMILIANA D'CUNHA REBELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'CUNHA REBELLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 May 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 May 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2003