THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-6990
Extension: 226
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Cadotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cadotte (CPSO#: 78932 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3609
Business Address: 9-1661 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9B7
(613) 738-6990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-6990
Extension: 226
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Cadotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cadotte (CPSO#: 78932 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3609
Business Address: 9-1661 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1J 9B7
(613) 738-6990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENE CADOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADOTTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENE CADOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADOTTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2003
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2003