THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-1277
Fax: (905) 428-8108
Address: Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: shahwesh medicine professional corp
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shawesh (CPSO#: 78935 )
Business Address: 30 Coach Crescent
Whitby Ontario L1R 0K8
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4

Corporation Name: Shawesh Medicine Professional Corp
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2024

Corporation Name: Shawesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-1277
Fax: (905) 428-8108
Address: Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: shahwesh medicine professional corp
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shawesh (CPSO#: 78935 )
Business Address: 30 Coach Crescent
Whitby Ontario L1R 0K8
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4

Corporation Name: Shawesh Medicine Professional Corp
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2024

Corporation Name: Shawesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALEK HASSUNA E SHAWESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAWESH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALEK HASSUNA E SHAWESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAWESH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2003