THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:48:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4996
Fax: 905-721-6673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Keeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. El-Keeb (CPSO#: 78945 )
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4996
Fax: 905-721-6673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Keeb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. El-Keeb (CPSO#: 78945 )
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABEA ABDULMONAIM HASEN EL-KEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KEEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RABEA ABDULMONAIM HASEN EL-KEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KEEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2003