THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bram Centre Medical Clinic
Unit 16
7910 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 752-1571
Fax: (289) 752-6439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. SINGARAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Singaram (CPSO#: 78951 ) Dr. P. Francis (CPSO#: 78990 )
Business Address: 7910 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
289 752 1517

Corporation Name: P. K. Francis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Singaram (CPSO#: 78951 ) Dr. P. Francis (CPSO#: 78990 )
Business Address: BramCentre Medical Clinic
7910 Hurontairo Street
Unit 16
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
(289) 752-1571

Corporation Name: D. Singaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, TAMIL
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bram Centre Medical Clinic
Unit 16
7910 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 752-1571
Fax: (289) 752-6439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. SINGARAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Singaram (CPSO#: 78951 ) Dr. P. Francis (CPSO#: 78990 )
Business Address: 7910 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
289 752 1517

Corporation Name: P. K. Francis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Singaram (CPSO#: 78951 ) Dr. P. Francis (CPSO#: 78990 )
Business Address: BramCentre Medical Clinic
7910 Hurontairo Street
Unit 16
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0P6
(289) 752-1571

Corporation Name: D. Singaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA KAMALAM FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA KAMALAM FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2003
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2003