THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:07:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
R F E G S 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Somers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Somers (CPSO#: 78992 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
R F E G S 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
R F E G S 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Somers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Somers (CPSO#: 78992 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
R F E G S 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA DENISE SOMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA DENISE SOMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003