THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:28:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Centre for Family Medicine
10-B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032
Address: 25 Joseph Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4X6
Phone: (519) 578-2100
Fax: (519) 578-2109

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lee-Poy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee-Poy (CPSO#: 78998 )
Business Address: Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
(519) 783-0022
Business Address: The Centre for Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4X8
(519) 578-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Centre for Family Medicine
10-B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032
Address: 25 Joseph Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4X6
Phone: (519) 578-2100
Fax: (519) 578-2109

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lee-Poy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee-Poy (CPSO#: 78998 )
Business Address: Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
(519) 783-0022
Business Address: The Centre for Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4X8
(519) 578-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL FRANK LEE-POY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE-POY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL FRANK LEE-POY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE-POY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003