THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: 9052787077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-71 King St W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
Phone: 9052799971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4288 Village Centre Court
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1S2
Phone: 9052750058
Fax: 9052751686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KENNETH LUK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Luk (CPSO#: 78999 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: Spectrum Oral Surgery
301-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
(905) 279-9971
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5G 3H5
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: Fountainview Oral Surgery
4288 Village Centre Crt
Mississauga ON L4Z 1S2
(905) 275-0058
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
9058132200
Business Address: The Mississauga Cosmetic Surgery & Laser Clinic
247 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B9
(905) 273-3045

Corporation Name: Kenneth Luk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: 9052787077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301-71 King St W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2
Phone: 9052799971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4288 Village Centre Court
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 1S2
Phone: 9052750058
Fax: 9052751686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KENNETH LUK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Luk (CPSO#: 78999 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: Spectrum Oral Surgery
301-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
(905) 279-9971
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5G 3H5
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: Fountainview Oral Surgery
4288 Village Centre Crt
Mississauga ON L4Z 1S2
(905) 275-0058
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
9058132200
Business Address: The Mississauga Cosmetic Surgery & Laser Clinic
247 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B9
(905) 273-3045

Corporation Name: Kenneth Luk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH DENNIS LUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH DENNIS LUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003