THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:58:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hashmat Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khan (CPSO#: 79010 )
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hashmat Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khan (CPSO#: 79010 )
Business Address: 2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale Ontario M9W 4L6
(416) 741-4545

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASHMAT UDDIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASHMAT UDDIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003