THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:51:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5 Quarry Ridge Rd.
Suite LL1
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-797-1112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
Anesthesia Department
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Brooks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brooks (CPSO#: 79014 )
Business Address: Department of Anesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: LL 1
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 797-1112
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5 Quarry Ridge Rd.
Suite LL1
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-797-1112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
Anesthesia Department
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Brooks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brooks (CPSO#: 79014 )
Business Address: Department of Anesthesia
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: LL 1
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 797-1112
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PHILIP BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PHILIP BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003