THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G5
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linsey S. Mutch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mutch (CPSO#: 79022 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-7525
Business Address: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
(705) 495-8135

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay Ontario P1B 8G5
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linsey S. Mutch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mutch (CPSO#: 79022 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-7525
Business Address: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
(705) 495-8135

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINSEY SHELAGH MUTCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINSEY SHELAGH MUTCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003