THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
55 Head Street
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-627-9941
Fax: 905-628-8428
Address: 76 Victoria Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1L5
Phone: 5195874658
Fax: 5195874118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tracy T. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheng (CPSO#: 79024 )
Business Address: 216 West Street
Center for Addictions and Mental Health Services
Suite 103
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
5194268760
Business Address: 202 - 55 Head Street
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
(905) 627-9941
Business Address: Center for Addictions Mental Health
216 West Street
Suite 404
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
(519) 426-8760

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
55 Head Street
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-627-9941
Fax: 905-628-8428
Address: 76 Victoria Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1L5
Phone: 5195874658
Fax: 5195874118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tracy T. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheng (CPSO#: 79024 )
Business Address: 216 West Street
Center for Addictions and Mental Health Services
Suite 103
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
5194268760
Business Address: 202 - 55 Head Street
Dundas Ontario L9H 3H8
(905) 627-9941
Business Address: Center for Addictions Mental Health
216 West Street
Suite 404
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
(519) 426-8760

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACY TAK-WAI CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACY TAK-WAI CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003