THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:06:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-726-8440
Fax: 519-913-3899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omer Chaudhary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Chaudhary (CPSO#: 79032 )
Business Address: 517 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0C1
(519) 657-7096
Business Address: 74 Front Street East
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1Y7
(519) 245-0430
Business Address: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
226-726-8440

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-726-8440
Fax: 519-913-3899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omer Chaudhary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Chaudhary (CPSO#: 79032 )
Business Address: 517 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0C1
(519) 657-7096
Business Address: 74 Front Street East
Strathroy Ontario N7G 1Y7
(519) 245-0430
Business Address: 351 Frances St
Strathroy Caradoc Family Medicine
Strathroy ON N7G 2L7
226-726-8440

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMER ARSHED CHAUDHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHARY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMER ARSHED CHAUDHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHARY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003