THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:29:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolyn Snider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Snider (CPSO#: 79036 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5687

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolyn Snider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Snider (CPSO#: 79036 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5687

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN ELAINE SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN ELAINE SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003